THE SOCIETY OF SCHOOLMASTERS AND SCHOOLMISTRESSES
Charity number: 206693
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Total income: £7,153
Total expenditure: £4,002
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
Registration history:
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 06 October 2018: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 06 October 2018: Funds transferred to 1168445 THE TEACHING STAFF TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- SOSS (Working name)
- THE SOCIETY OF SCHOOLMASTERS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.70k | £9.01k | £8.03k | £7.45k | £7.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.73k | £6.31k | £4.90k | £7.47k | £4.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 16 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 18 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 26 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES 1821 AS REVISED 1972 AND 2ND MARCH 1978 AND SCHEME OF 10TH DECEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
ASSISTANCE TO NECESSITOUS MASTERS OF ALL SECONDARY, PRIMARY, PREPARATORY SCHOOLS, THEIR WIDOWS AND ORPHANS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE GOVERNING INSTURMENT).
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window