Accounts and annual returns JERUSALEM LODGE NO 197 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 206735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 22 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 14 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 25 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required