Accounts and annual returns STAFFORD'S CHARITY

Charity number: 206770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 November 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 03 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window