ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NORTH ESSEX BRANCH

Charity number: 206799
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 17 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 July 2017 On time Download