ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NORTH ESSEX BRANCH

Charity number: 206799

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julia Byers Chair 17 May 2017 None on record
Ruth Jubb Trustee 16 September 2020 None on record
Fiona Lawes Trustee 01 March 2018
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NORTH WEST ESSEX BRANCH Received: On time
Kris Lown Trustee 01 February 2018 None on record
Dorothy Lee Trustee 17 April 2018
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NORTH WEST ESSEX BRANCH Received: On time
Joanna Hall Trustee None on record