LONDON ELECTRICITY BENEVOLENT SOCIETY (LEBS)

Charity number: 206851
Removed charity
Governing document
RULES AS REVISED 11TH JUNE 1959, 6TH DECEMBER 1960, 22ND OCTOBER 1981 AND 16TH OCTOBER 1990 AS AMENDED 16TH OCTOBER 1990
Charitable objects
(1)GRANTING RELIEF IN CASE OF NECESSITY BY WAY OF GIFT OR LOAN IN MONEY OR KIND: A. TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY OR IN RESPECT OF MEMBERS OR DECEASED MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY; B. TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF OR IN RESPECT OF EMPLOYEES OR PAST EMPLOYEES OF THE BOARD (BEING PERSONS WHO ALTHOUGH NOT MEMBERS OR PAST MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY ARE OR WERE ELIGIBLE FOR MEMBERSHIP) IN ANY CASE IN WHICH THE COMMITTEE ARE OF THE OPINION THAT SUCH ASSISTANCE IS DESIRABLE. (C) TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF OR IN RESPECT OF PERSONS WHO HAVE CEASED WITHIN THE PERIOD OF TWELVE MONTHS IMMEDIATELY PRIOR TO APPLYING FOR GRANT TO BE IN THE EMPLOYMENT OF THE BOARD OTHERWISE THAN ON RETIREMENT AND WHO IMMEDIATELY PRIOR TO SUCH CESSATION WERE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY. (2)PROVIDE BY SUBSCRIPTIONS FROM MEMBERS, CONTRIBUTIONS FROM THE BOARD AND DONATIONS, A FUND OUT OF WHICH THE SOCIETY, ACTING THROUGH THE COMMITTEE, MAY SUBJECT AS AFORESAID IN THEIR SOLE UNFETTERED DISCRETION GRANT SUCH ASSISTANCE AS AFORESAID; AND (3) CONTRIBUTE IF AND AS THE COMMITTEE THINK FIT OUT OF ANY SUCH FUND AS AFORESAID PROVIDED SUCH PAYMENTS ARE FOR THE RELIEF OF NECESSITY AND OF SUCH A KIND AS WILL BE ALLOWABLE REVENUE EXPENDITURE FOR TAX PURPOSES IF CHARGED IN THE BOARD'S ACCOUNTS TO ANY FUND FROM WHICH GRANTS COULD LAWFULLY BE MADE TO THE SOCIETY TOWARDS PROVIDING SUCH ASSISTANCE AS AFORESAID.
Organisation type
No information available
Registration history
  • 22 September 1962 : registered
  • 14 June 2002 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names
  • THE LONDON ELECTRICITY BOARD BENEVOLENT SOCIETY (Previous name)
What the charity did
    No information available
Who the charity helped
    No information available
How the charity helped
    No information available