Dogfen lywodraethu THE INSURANCE CHARITIES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JULY 1902 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 26 JULY 1951, 21 JULY 1960, 5 SEPTEMBER 1963, 7 AUGUST 1973, 21 JANUARY 1997, 28 JULY 1999, 20 AUGUST 2003, 10 SEPTEMBER 2003 AND 23RD SEPTEMBER . AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 SEP 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TOWARDS THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP, SICKNESS, DISABILITY, OLD AGE OR DISTRESS OF PERSONS WHO ARE NOW OR HAVE BEEN ENGAGED IN ANY ASPECT OF THE INSURANCE INDUSTRY AND OF CHILDREN, SPOUSES, PARTNERS, FORMER SPOUSES OR PARTNERS AND OTHER RELATIVES OR DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.