Trustees THE SOIL ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 206862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Anthony Ballance Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Lauren Anne Bryan Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Richard Friend Allan Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Sabine Vandenbroucke Trustee 01 November 2022
THE NATIONAL ARMY MUSEUM
Received: On time
ROSEMARY ANNE RADCLIFFE Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
Steven Lancaster Lizars Trustee 20 July 2021
None on record
Caroline Ann Missen Trustee 20 July 2021
None on record
Philip Edward Fearnley Trustee 20 July 2021
None on record
Jonathan William Spencer Trustee 01 March 2020
None on record
Andrew Stanley Burgess Trustee 01 November 2019
None on record
Martin John Nye Trustee 01 November 2017
WOB FOUNDATION
Overdue by 123 days
WILTSHIRE ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND NATURAL HISTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time
WILTSHIRE ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND NATURAL HISTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time
FOXHAM READING ROOM AND LIBRARY
Received: On time
WORLDREADER
Received: On time
DEVIZES ASSIZE COURT TRUST
Received: On time
Prof Isabel Oliver Trustee 15 March 2017
None on record