DAME MARY CHOWN'S CHARITY AND OTHER CHARITIES

Charity number: 206903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.44k £2.42k £2.50k £2.85k £2.28k
Total expenditure £983 £1.18k £1.10k £1.18k £1.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A