Financial history ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS WEST SUFFOLK BRANCH

Charity number: 206965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £148.38k £144.24k £215.67k £136.09k £153.49k
Total expenditure £182.34k £194.22k £233.76k £223.83k £671.17k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £27.00k N/A