Financial history DR PUNSFER'S GIFT

Charity number: 206971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £16.88k £2.18k £2.86k £2.14k £2.22k
Total expenditure £44.72k £0 £0 £2.20k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A