Financial history STANLEY BROADWAY BRIND

Charity number: 207008
Charity reporting is overdue by 230 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £266 £267 £502 £510 £0
Total expenditure £75 £0 £125 £135 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A