Trustees ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PROTECTION OF BIRDS

Charity number: 207076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kevin John Cox Chair 07 October 2017
None on record
Edward Keith Jones Trustee 14 October 2023
None on record
William James Sutherland Trustee 17 January 2023
RIVER LARK CATCHMENT PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
James Fergus Sloane Trustee 15 October 2022
None on record
James Nicholas Lowther Trustee 15 October 2022
None on record
Ghazala Koosar Trustee 15 October 2022
NORTHERN ROOTS (OLDHAM) LTD
Received: On time
Dr Benjamin Lian Caldecott Trustee 15 October 2022
None on record
JOHN MASON Trustee 07 December 2021
None on record
Judith Annett Trustee 10 October 2020
None on record
Alexander John Randall Trustee 10 October 2020
HUMAN TRAFFICKING FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SARACENS SPORT FOUNDATION
Received: On time
UK OVERSEAS TERRITORIES CONSERVATION FORUM
Received: On time
THE BAT CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
Thin Green Line Foundation UK
Received: On time
Victoria Jane Nash Trustee 26 October 2019
None on record
Veronica Moraa Pickering Trustee 26 October 2019
None on record
Kerry Elizabeth Ten Kate Trustee 20 October 2018
None on record
Robert Cubbage Trustee 20 October 2018
None on record