Trustees THE FRIENDS OF EXETER CATHEDRAL

Charity number: 207096
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosemary Yallop Dr Chair 29 June 2022
DEVON GARDENS TRUST
Received: On time
James Frampton Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Dr Reuben Ayres Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Rev Ian Charles Morter Trustee 29 June 2018
THE POSBURY ST FRANCIS TRUST
Received: On time
THE VERY REVD JONATHAN GREENER Trustee 01 December 2017
EXETER CATHEDRAL MUSIC FOUNDATION TRUST
Received: On time
THE MOUNT DINHAM COTTAGE TRUST, EXETER
Received: On time
EXETER CATHEDRAL SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE EXETER DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
Fiona Thompson Trustee 29 June 2016
None on record
Jonathan Walker Trustee 29 June 2016
None on record
JOE RODERICK Trustee 29 June 2015
None on record
Peter Owen Pawson Trustee 29 June 2015
None on record
Diane Walker Trustee 29 June 2015
None on record