THE MARILLIER ANNUITY FUND

Charity number: 207138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £487 £468 £308 £474 £476
Total expenditure £10.68k £11.35k £11.81k £11.94k £19.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A