CENTRE FOR POLICY ON AGEING

Charity number: 207163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 21 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 21 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 29 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 29 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 20 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 20 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 30 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 30 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 16 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 16 June 2017 On time Download