OXFORD AND ST GEORGE'S JEWISH YOUTH TRUST

Charity number: 207191
Charity reporting is overdue by 359 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 359 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 359 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 March 2021 515 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 April 2020 540 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 August 2018 288 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 15 August 2018 288 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 19 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 19 October 2016 On time Download