OXFORD AND ST GEORGE'S JEWISH YOUTH TRUST

Charity number: 207191
Charity reporting is overdue by 359 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Benjamin Marcus Rose Trustee 02 December 2014 None on record
Rebecca Livingston Trustee 07 March 2017 None on record
MICHAEL HENRY QUIXANO HENRIQUES Trustee 07 October 2014 None on record
GARY ANDREW DAVIS Trustee 07 October 2014 None on record
SIMON HOFFMAN Trustee 07 October 2014 None on record
Penelope Grant Trustee 06 June 2017 None on record
Jon Philip Lishak Trustee 01 January 2006 None on record
DANIEL PAUL LISHAK Trustee 07 October 2014
THE JOELY BEAR APPEAL Received: On time
Samantha Lishak Trustee 09 September 2017 None on record
IAN BRADLEY REVENS Trustee 07 October 2014 None on record