SOCIETY OF ANTIQUARIES OF LONDON

Charity number: 207237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.77m £3.81m £2.26m £2.63m £2.57m
Total expenditure £2.18m £1.82m £2.05m £2.36m £2.26m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £302.28k £2.31m £620.80k £957.23k £978.71k
Income - Other trading activities £436.09k £437.70k £486.21k £489.44k £382.58k
Income - Charitable activities £572.95k £580.63k £618.20k £592.32k £633.04k
Income - Endowments £0 £1.58m £0 £53.94k £0
Income - Investment £459.91k £474.19k £537.11k £551.11k £558.46k
Income - Other £784 £10.88k £1.50k £44.82k £15.11k
Income - Legacies £0 £603.15k £18.48k £119.76k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.75m £1.49m £1.77m £2.07m £1.96m
Expenditure - Raising funds £432.06k £325.88k £275.50k £293.46k £295.20k
Expenditure - Governance £95.72k £73.22k £45.72k £60.55k £71.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £73.80k £79.59k £95.13k £102.49k £104.27k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0