Accounts and annual returns BRITISH UNION LODGE NO 114 MASONIC CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 207280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required