Accounts and annual returns DAMERHAM CRICKET GROUND

Charity number: 207382
Charity reporting is overdue by 115 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 115 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 115 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 18 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 04 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 20 April 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 27 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required