THE FRIENDS OF WARMINSTER HOSPITAL

Charity number: 207384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.52k £8.12k £8.11k £13.01k £5.94k
Total expenditure £9.43k £10.36k £10.86k £7.20k £15.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A