Financial history THE ROYAL NAVAL BENEVOLENT SOCIETY FOR OFFICERS

Charity number: 207405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £629.89k £647.42k £496.77k £708.45k £1.02m
Total expenditure £633.91k £622.71k £650.79k £725.67k £711.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £46.03k £56.48k N/A £278.93k £376.27k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £583.86k £590.93k N/A £429.52k £642.05k
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £10.10k £17.16k N/A £224.18k £341.37k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £575.17k £567.01k N/A £667.16k £688.02k
Expenditure - Raising funds £58.74k £55.70k N/A £58.51k £23.32k
Expenditure - Governance £14.85k £10.90k N/A £6.81k £9.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £56.22k £54.22k N/A £58.51k £19.60k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0