Trustees THE ROYAL NAVAL BENEVOLENT SOCIETY FOR OFFICERS
Charity number: 207405

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rear Admiral Michael Kimmons CB | Chair | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Commodore Angus Ross RN | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Fyfe-Green | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Lieutenant Samuel Williams RN | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Commander Michelle Westwood RN | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Surgeon Commander Gabriella Funmi Chirnside RN | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Commander Graham Peter Hockley LVO RN | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Wayland Peter Francis Austin | Trustee | 23 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
COMMANDER BEN HUGHES RN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VENERABLE MARTIN POLL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.