Accounts and annual returns CREETING ST MARY WELFARE CHARITIES

Charity number: 207445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required