ST AUSTELL OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 207449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 29 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required