ST AUSTELL OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 207449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.29k £6.84k £8.14k £4.54k £3.65k
Total expenditure £8.95k £7.78k £8.04k £5.13k £4.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £250 N/A