ALPINE GARDEN SOCIETY

Charity number: 207478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £668.62k £601.22k £599.37k £612.20k £468.70k
Total expenditure £713.50k £703.81k £709.85k £790.69k £633.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £13.44k
Income - Donations and legacies £170.95k £159.81k £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities £442.09k £377.31k £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £385.07k £398.51k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £55.58k £64.09k £63.50k £64.20k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £150.81k £149.48k N/A
Income - Legacies £28.08k £19.84k £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £339.86k £366.76k £379.86k £441.03k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £373.64k £337.06k £330.00k £349.66k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £6.76k £6.23k £5.69k £3.50k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £1.11k £1.47k £1.37k £945 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A