Trustees BARKINGSIDE DISABILITY THURSDAY CLUB
Charity number: 207505

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH ATKIN BAILEY CHAIRMAN | Chair | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE LLOYD | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
TINA GRAYSON | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARK GREEN TREASURER | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVE KRISMON DAVE | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
colin lachman colin | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
JEAN BAILEY | Trustee | 10 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEVE LUCKINS | Trustee | 13 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE DIXON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.