ASSOCIATION OF PHYSICIANS OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity number: 207530
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 November 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 November 2020 6 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 22 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 28 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 28 October 2016 On time Download