TOWN ESTATE CHARITY

Charity number: 207592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity is for the benefit of Mendlesham residents and Parish Church only. Income from assets is divided; half to St. Mary's Church Mendlesham towards repair, electricity, heating, insurance and upkeep of the fabric of the Parish Church and the maintenance of the services therein; the other half goes to the Charitable Account to assist individual sick and needy parishioners of Mendlesham.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £8,721
Total expenditure: £9,466

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
  • 10 August 1993: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Mendlesham Welfare Foundation (Working name)
  • CHURCH AND TOWN ESTATE CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL ARTHUR ALLEN Chair 19 June 2013
None on record
Richard Charles Knock Trustee 19 November 2024
None on record
Julie Williams Trustee 10 July 2023
None on record
Stephen James Fenning Trustee 08 March 2016
THE FORGE COMMUNITY CHURCH
Received: On time
THE FURTHER FASTER NETWORK
Received: On time
ROUTE2FREEDOM
Received: On time
REVEREND PHILIP THOMAS GRAY Trustee
THE ST MARY THE VIRGIN MENDLESHAM CHARITABLE TRUST
Recently registered
THE ST JOSEPH'S MENDLESHAM CHARITABLE TRUST
Recently registered
MENDLESHAM EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S, MENDLESHAM
Received: On time
MR DAVID LAMBERT Trustee
None on record
RAYMOND MILES FENNING Trustee
MENDLESHAM EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.64k £8.63k £9.09k £9.78k £8.72k
Total expenditure £8.17k £5.10k £5.35k £5.38k £9.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 15 JUNE 1983 AND RESOLUTION DATED 23 FEBRUARY 1993 PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF S 43 CA 1992
Charitable objects
(ASSETS TRANSFERRED TO TOWN ESTATE CHARITY) TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MENDLESHAM
Registration history
  • 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
  • 10 August 1993 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
2 Old Orchard
Mendlesham
STOWMARKET
IP14 5TY
Phone:
07540 288388
Website:

No information available