Accounts and annual returns THE MISSES ALLAN CHRISTMAS CHARITY

Charity number: 207625
Charity reporting is overdue by 236 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 236 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 236 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required