Financial history THE MISSES ALLAN CHRISTMAS CHARITY

Charity number: 207625
Charity reporting is overdue by 234 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £155 £158 £163 £166 £173
Total expenditure £0 £158 £163 £166 £173
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A