Accounts and annual returns THE ARCHIBALD FLEMING JUBILEE TRUST

Charity number: 207668
Charity reporting is overdue by 46 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 46 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 46 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 22 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 24 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 15 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required