Financial history THE ARCHIBALD FLEMING JUBILEE TRUST

Charity number: 207668
Charity reporting is overdue by 79 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £439 £439 £442 £340 £316
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £274 £226
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A