GOVERNORS OF THE CHARITY FOR RELIEF OF THE POOR WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OF CLERGYMEN (COMMONLY CALLED CLERGY SUPPORT TRUST)

Charity number: 207736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.18m £3.96m £4.68m £4.27m £3.67m
Total expenditure £3.46m £3.67m £4.00m £4.34m £3.73m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £148.47k £155.42k £185.77k £127.14k £311.48k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £382.69k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.65m £3.80m £4.11m £4.13m £3.36m
Income - Other £0 £0 £386.33k £13.69k £0
Income - Legacies £62.56k £74.70k £100.75k £46.89k £236.78k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.17m £3.36m £3.66m £4.06m £3.46m
Expenditure - Raising funds £292.84k £314.04k £333.70k £282.98k £271.12k
Expenditure - Governance £26.50k £18.99k £31.28k £29.53k £20.08k
Expenditure - Grants institution £161.57k £95.00k £69.00k £10.00k £90.10k
Expenditure - Investment management £279.40k £301.51k £319.41k £268.47k £255.39k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0