Dogfen lywodraethu GOVERNORS OF THE CHARITY FOR RELIEF OF THE POOR WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OF CLERGYMEN (COMMONLY CALLED CLERGY SUPPORT TRUST)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
THE ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED IN 1678 AMENDED BY THE SCHEME DATED 3/2/1971 BROUGHT INTO EFFECT BY AN ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 5/4/1971 AND AMENDED BY THE SCHEME DATED 26 SEPTEMBER 2012 BROUGHT INTO EFFECT BY THE ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 17 OCTOBER 2012 AND AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 03/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19/10/2017 BROUGHT INTO EFFECT BY THE ORDER IN COURT DATED 15/11/2017 AS AMENDED ON 12 FEB 2019 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 28 NOV 2019 BROUGHT INTO EFFECT BY THE ORDER IN COURT DATED 12 FEBRUARY 2020.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO BENEFICIARIES, WHETHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, IN SUCH MANNER AS AND BY SUCH MEANS AS THE COURT OF ASSISTANTS FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR THE RELIEF OR PREVENTION OF POVERTY OR HARDSHIP OR FOR THE RELIEF OF ILLNESS AND THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH, WHETHER PHYSICAL OR MENTAL. "BENEFICIARIES" MEANS MEMBERS OF THE CLERGY, ORDINANDS AND THE SPOUSES, FORMER SPOUSES, CHILDREN AND DEPENDANTS OF LIVING OR DECEASED MEMBERS OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE CLERGY OR OF ORDINANDS. (A) "CHILDREN" INCLUDES ADOPTED CHILDREN, STEP-CHILDREN AND PERSONS TREATED AS THE CHILDREN OF A MARRIAGE OR CIVIL PARTNERSHIP. (B) “CIVIL PARTNERS” MEANS THE MEMBERS OF A CIVIL PARTNERSHIP WITHIN THE MEANING OF SECTION 1(1) OF THE CIVIL PARTNERSHIP ACT 2004. (C) "CLERGY" AND "MEMBERS OF THE CLERGY" MEAN BISHOPS, PRIESTS AND DEACONS OF THE ANGLICAN COMMUNION. (D) "ORDINANDS" MEANS PERSONS WHO ARE PREPARING FOR ORDINATION AS MEMBERS OF THE CLERGY. (E) THE "SPOUSE" OF A PERSON MEANS HIS OR HER WIFE, HUSBAND, CIVIL PARTNER, WIDOW, WIDOWER OR SURVIVING CIVIL PARTNER.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.