ST CHRISTOPHER'S FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 207782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £16.93m £16.33m £17.86m £17.99m £18.18m
Total expenditure £17.26m £16.13m £19.43m £18.44m £18.22m
Income from government contracts £3.76m £3.86m £10.38m £3.67m £9.63m
Income from government grants £519.21k £126.31k £403.00k £177.00k £365.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £172.00k £88.00k £129.00k £169.00k £299.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £16.76m £16.24m £17.71m £17.81m £17.81m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £280 £910 £13.00k £14.00k £2.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £67.00k
Income - Legacies £70.83k £0 £1.00k £0 £5.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £17.15m £16.07m £19.28m £18.14m £17.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £110.00k £58.00k £151.00k £296.00k £346.00k
Expenditure - Governance £36.65k £41.37k £43.78k £28.30k £35.08k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £5.00k £4.00k £71.00k