Accounts and annual returns BENEVOLENT SOCIETY OF BLUES

Charity number: 207818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 27 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 24 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 24 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 18 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 18 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 18 June 2019 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 18 June 2019 49 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 07 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 07 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window