Financial history THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY

Charity number: 207890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £63.41m £63.59m £67.25m £64.80m £63.68m
Total expenditure £57.99m £59.65m £65.68m £64.29m £64.46m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £163.00k £647.00k £411.00k £115.00k £190.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £242.00k £126.00k £579.00k £184.00k £588.00k
Income - Other trading activities £637.00k £661.00k £593.00k £124.00k £49.00k
Income - Charitable activities £61.54m £61.77m £65.00m £63.54m £62.21m
Income - Endowments £105.00k £44.00k £367.00k £56.00k £62.00k
Income - Investment £1.04m £1.00m £1.08m £890.00k £805.00k
Income - Other £64.00k £27.00k £4.00k £56.00k £19.00k
Income - Legacies £26.00k £24.00k £0 £0 £89.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £56.75m £57.64m £64.02m £63.05m £62.53m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.24m £2.02m £1.66m £1.23m £1.93m
Expenditure - Governance £242.00k £286.00k £333.00k £338.00k £356.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £100.00k £819.00k £360.00k £600.00k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £395.00k £753.00k £772.00k £625.00k £1.51m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0