THE SIR OSWALD STOLL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 207939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
DEED OF GIFT AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28TH NOVEMBER 1923 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF THE COMMISSION DATED 17 JULY 1953, 16 OCTOBER 1956, 22 OCTOBER 2003, 16 DECEMBER 2008 AND 23 JULY 2009.
Charitable objects
HOMES FOR (A) MEN OR WOMEN WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN OR THE MERCHANT NAVY AND WHO ARE IN NEED OR VULNERABLE BY REASON OF THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL HEALTH, SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, AND (B) WIDOWS, WIDOWERS AND SURVIVING DEPENDANTS OF MEN OR WOMEN WHO SERVED IN THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN OR THE MERCHANT NAVY AND WHO ARE IN NEED OR VULNERABLE BY REASON OF THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL HEALTH, SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR PEOPLE WHO WERE BORN, RESIDED IN OR CURRENTLY RESIDE IN THE PARISH OF CHISWICK.
Area of benefit
CHISWICK
Registration history
  • 29 October 2003 : Standard registration