THE SIR OSWALD STOLL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 207939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROGER SHRIMPLIN Trustee 12 February 2015 None on record
Paul Brookes Trustee 15 September 2020 None on record
Katherine Russell Trustee 29 November 2018 None on record
UTA HOPE Trustee 12 February 2015 None on record
Simon Patrick Philips Trustee 13 November 2014 None on record
David Arthur Trustee 05 December 2019 None on record
CLARE HUGHES Trustee 01 November 2011
COOPERS CHARITY CIO Received: On time
Richard David Freeman Trustee 03 October 2020 None on record
Mark Robert Sweeny Trustee 01 January 2022
THE RETREAT ASSOCIATION Received: On time
THE RETREAT ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Dr Ian Fyfe-Green Trustee 01 January 2022
THE ROYAL NAVAL BENEVOLENT SOCIETY FOR OFFICERS Received: On time
Karl Craig Trustee 05 December 2019 None on record
Raymond Lock CBE Chair 09 February 2018 None on record
TIMOTHY DAVID ROSSINGTON Trustee 09 February 2018
ARTS AT THE OLD FIRE STATION Received: On time
George Thornton Trustee 12 November 2015 None on record