Financial history UNIVERSITIES FEDERATION FOR ANIMAL WELFARE

Charity number: 207996
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £707.25k £389.69k £506.47k £426.99k £383.33k
Total expenditure £710.56k £603.47k £734.33k £566.31k £642.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £281.37k N/A £146.31k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £212.26k N/A £142.97k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £213.61k N/A £217.19k N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £88.00k N/A £67.49k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £626.12k N/A £630.84k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £84.44k N/A £103.49k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £150.99k N/A £199.39k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £96.26k N/A £68.79k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £43.31k N/A £42.59k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A