THE HARDY PLANT SOCIETY

Charity number: 208080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 November 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 November 2020 1 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 26 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 16 April 2017 On time Download