THE HARDY PLANT SOCIETY

Charity number: 208080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £124.34k £132.68k £129.07k £125.10k £115.35k
Total expenditure £98.66k £117.50k £120.08k £129.11k £106.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A