SURREY DEAF CHILDREN'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 208084
Charity reporting is up to date (116 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 February 2021 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 February 2021 116 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 23 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 25 October 2016 On time Download