SURREY DEAF CHILDREN'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 208084
Charity reporting is up to date (116 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £27.97k £30.35k £33.81k £19.56k £63.48k
Total expenditure £35.35k £35.89k £37.68k £29.78k £79.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A