Accounts and annual returns SURREY DISPENSARY

Charity number: 208091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 April 2019 167 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required