CHIGWELL UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 208106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 11 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required