CHARITIES OF JOHN GREEN AND OTHERS

Charity number: 208113
Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.03k £1.03k £1.05k £1.05k £675
Total expenditure £310 £310 £350 £764 £1.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A